« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Harder, Aaron      
Kevin Richard Hevel - (2)
 
Defendant  M   CASTILLO, ALFONSO   Master Calendar  CR2017-143619-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  9/22/2017  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/2/2017 
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  9/22/2017  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/2/2017 
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  9/22/2017  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/2/2017 
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1104A3 (F1)  MURDER 2ND DEG-EXT INDIFFRENC  9/22/2017  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/2/2017 
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  9/22/2017  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/2/2017 
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1104A3 (F1)  MURDER 2ND DEG-EXT INDIFFRENC  9/22/2017       
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  9/22/2017       
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  9/22/2017       
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  9/22/2017       
Kevin Richard Hevel  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  9/22/2017       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/4/2017  599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/4/2017   
11/27/2017  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/29/2017   
11/22/2017  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/22/2017   
11/21/2017  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  11/27/2017   
11/21/2017  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/27/2017   
NOTE: TEMPORARY
11/21/2017  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/27/2017   
11/20/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  11/20/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
11/16/2017  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  11/17/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES
11/16/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  11/17/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance
11/16/2017  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  11/17/2017   
NOTE: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY, LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
11/16/2017  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)  11/17/2017   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(c)
11/14/2017  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  11/14/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
11/14/2017  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  11/14/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
11/2/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/3/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S GLENDALE FIRE DEPARTMENT RECORDS
10/20/2017  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  10/25/2017   
10/12/2017  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
10/6/2017  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  10/6/2017   
NOTE: Release Order/$200,000
9/29/2017  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  10/2/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
9/29/2017  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  10/2/2017   
9/29/2017  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  10/2/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
9/29/2017  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  10/2/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
9/26/2017  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  9/26/2017   
9/26/2017  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/27/2017   
NOTE: IA Packet
9/26/2017  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  9/27/2017   
NOTE: IA Release Order
9/26/2017  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  9/27/2017   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/22/2017  23:00   Initial Appearance 
9/28/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
10/2/2017  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
10/6/2017  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
11/17/2017  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
12/18/2017  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
2/5/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/24/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/31/2018  8:00   Trial 
click here for Law Library Resource Center